IN SB0291 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Probate code study commission. Establishes the probate code study commission (commission). Allows the commission to meet only during interim periods. Requires the commission to study and recommend to the general assembly changes that are needed in the probate code (IC 29-1), the trust code (IC 30-4), and other statutes affecting the administration of a decedent's estate, guardianships, probate jurisdiction, trusts, or fiduciaries. Provides for the governor to appoint nine members, each of whom must reside in a separate Indiana congressional district; for the governor to appoint two additional members who work in the trust departments of financial institutions; for the
Title
Probate code study commission. Establishes the probate code study commission (commission). Allows the commission to meet only during interim periods. Requires the commission to study and recommend to the general assembly changes that are needed in the probate code (IC 29-1), the trust code (IC 30-4), and other statutes affecting the administration of a decedent's estate, guardianships, probate jurisdiction, trusts, or fiduciaries. Provides for the governor to appoint nine members, each of whom must reside in a separate Indiana congressional district; for the governor to appoint two additional members who work in the trust departments of financial institutions; for the
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Zakas [R] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Sen. Michael Delph [R] | Sen. John Broden [D] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Civil Law - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Civil Law - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Representative Koch added as sponsor |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 81: yeas 45, nays 5 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Zakas) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Senators Delph, Broden, Randolph added as coauthors |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Senator Steele added as second author |
2015-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Zakas |