IN SB0287 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Expungement. Provides that expungement provisions concerning an arrest that does not lead to a conviction also apply to criminal charges or juvenile delinquency allegations that do not lead to a conviction or juvenile delinquency adjudication. Provides that a person who files for the expungement of an arrest, criminal charge, or juvenile delinquency allegation that did not lead to a conviction or juvenile delinquency adjudication is not required to pay a filing fee. Specifies that a person who files a petition for expungement is not required to pay a filing fee. Removes a requirement that the petitioner submit bureau of motor
Title
Expungement. Provides that expungement provisions concerning an arrest that does not lead to a conviction also apply to criminal charges or juvenile delinquency allegations that do not lead to a conviction or juvenile delinquency adjudication. Provides that a person who files for the expungement of an arrest, criminal charge, or juvenile delinquency allegation that did not lead to a conviction or juvenile delinquency adjudication is not required to pay a filing fee. Specifies that a person who files a petition for expungement is not required to pay a filing fee. Removes a requirement that the petitioner submit bureau of motor
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. Judson McMillin [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Representative McMillin added as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 230: yeas 41, nays 9 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as third author |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senator Steele added as second author |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Young R Michael |