IN SB0285 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 243
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Annexation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Annexation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-26 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 243
2013-05-11SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-05-03HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-30SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-26SenateJoint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate
2013-04-26HouseJoint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House
2013-04-26HouseConference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 646: yeas 95, nays 2
2013-04-26HouseRules suspended
2013-04-26SenateConference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 570: yeas 41, nays 9
2013-04-15HouseHouse advisors appointed: Thompson, Mayfield and Bartlett
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Karickhoff and Candelaria Reardon
2013-04-11SenateSenate advisors appointed: Bray, R. Young and Zakas
2013-04-11SenateSenate conferee appointed: Buck and Stoops
2013-04-11SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2013-04-10HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2013-04-10HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 451: yeas 93, nays 0
2013-04-04HouseAmendment 4 (Thompson), prevailed; voice vote
2013-04-04HouseAmendment 3 (Karickhoff), prevailed; voice vote
2013-04-04HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-04-01HouseRepresentative Candelaria Reardon added as cosponsor
2013-03-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-03-12HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2013-01-31SenateCosponsors: Reps. Mayfield and VanNatter
2013-01-31SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Karickhoff
2013-01-31SenateReferred to the House
2013-01-31SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 53: yeas 49 and nays 0
2013-01-29SenateAmendment 1 (Buck), prevailed; voice vote
2013-01-29SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-01-28SenateSenator Crider added as third author
2013-01-28SenateSenator Bray added as second author
2013-01-24SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-01-08SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2013-01-08SenateAuthored by Senator Buck

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2013&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SB&docno=0285
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/IN/IN0285.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/SB/SB0285.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/SB/SB0285.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/ES/ES0285.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/ES/ES0285.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/SE/SE0285.1.html
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0053.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0451.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0570.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0646.PDF.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback