IN SB0279 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Distribution of revenue for public safety purposes. Provides that, subject to the approval of a county adopting body, a fire protection district or a qualified fire protection territory may apply for distributions of tax revenue. Provides that a township that provides fire protection or emergency medical services (other than a township in Marion County) may apply to a county adopting body for a distribution of tax revenue for public safety purposes. Requires the adopting body to conduct a public hearing to review and approve the application. Specifies the method for determining the amount of the distribution to the qualified township.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Distribution of revenue for public safety purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2021-02-09SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-08SenateSenators Sandlin and Grooms added as coauthors
2021-02-08SenateCosponsors: Representatives Aylesworth and Olthoff
2021-02-08SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Slager
2021-02-08SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 70: yeas 48, nays 0
2021-02-04SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2021-02-04SenateSenator Charbonneau added as third author
2021-02-04SenateSenator Raatz added as second author
2021-02-02SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-28SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2021-01-11SenateAuthored by Senator Niemeyer

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/279/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/2/a/cd2a7ffc/SB0279.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/0/8/0108fbe4/SB0279.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/3/6/ee36b9d4/SB0279.02.COMS.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/c/9/f/0c9f03fd/SB0279.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/5/1/f3511de5/SB0279.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/9/4/eb94927b/SB0279.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/1/d/3/61d3d062/SB0279.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/b/5/b2b51307/SB0279.02.COMS.FN003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/9/5/0895088d/SB0279.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/6/d/416d790d/SB0279.70_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback