IN SB0277 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-06 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Healthy food initiative program. Establishes the healthy food initiative program (program) to be administered by the Indiana housing and community development authority (authority) to assist new businesses, existing businesses, and other legal entities to offer fresh or unprocessed foods within an underserved geographic area. Defines "underserved geographic area". Requires the authority to establish: (1) criteria for awarding grants and making loans under the program; and (2) terms and conditions for recipients of the grants and loans. Specifies the permissible uses of grants and loans. Establishes the healthy food initiative fund for purposes of awarding grants and loans under the program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Healthy food initiative program. Establishes the healthy food initiative program (program) to be administered by the Indiana housing and community development authority (authority) to assist new businesses, existing businesses, and other legal entities to offer fresh or unprocessed foods within an underserved geographic area. Defines "underserved geographic area". Requires the authority to establish: (1) criteria for awarding grants and making loans under the program; and (2) terms and conditions for recipients of the grants and loans. Specifies the permissible uses of grants and loans. Establishes the healthy food initiative fund for purposes of awarding grants and loans under the program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2017-02-28SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-23SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Olthoff
2017-02-23SenateCosponsors: Representatives Davisson, Shackleford and GiaQuinta
2017-02-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 179: yeas 42, nays 7
2017-02-14SenateSenator Breaux added as coauthor
2017-02-14SenateAmendment #2 (Kenley) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-14SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-09SenateCommittee report: without recommendation, adopted
2017-02-09SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
2017-02-06SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2017-02-06SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2017-01-30SenateSenator Ford added as second author
2017-01-30SenateSenator Ruckelshaus added as third author
2017-01-09SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
2017-01-09SenateAuthored by Senator Head

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback