IN SB0276 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Government and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Government and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Selection of poet laureate. Revises the selection process for a poet laureate. Provides that the selection committee may meet as necessary. Removes the requirement that a poet laureate be selected by December 1 of each odd-numbered year. Removes the fixed term duration and instead provides that the poet laureate serves a minimum of two years. Removes the $2,500 pay cap for a poet laureate. Provides that the Indiana arts commission may engage other partners for services as needed.
Title
Selection of poet laureate.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. Tonya Pfaff [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Pfaff |
2023-02-13 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Clere |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 104: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senator Alting added as second author |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-01-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ford Jon |