IN SB0275 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Senators Walker, Smith J, Sandlin, Niemeyer added as coauthors
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Senators Walker, Smith J, Sandlin, Niemeyer added as coauthors
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Old forest areas in state forests. Requires the department of natural resources (department), before January 1, 2019, to designate at least one undivided area comprising at least 30% of each state forest as an old forest area. Provides that, wherever possible, the size of a designated old forest area must be at least 500 acres. Sets forth certain purposes to guide the department in designating the old forest areas. Prohibits the department from conducting or allowing timber management in the old forest areas. Requires the department to produce and keep on file maps and legal descriptions of the designated old
Title
Old forest areas in state forests. Requires the department of natural resources (department), before January 1, 2019, to designate at least one undivided area comprising at least 30% of each state forest as an old forest area. Provides that, wherever possible, the size of a designated old forest area must be at least 500 acres. Sets forth certain purposes to guide the department in designating the old forest areas. Prohibits the department from conducting or allowing timber management in the old forest areas. Requires the department to produce and keep on file maps and legal descriptions of the designated old
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senators Walker, Smith J, Sandlin, Niemeyer added as coauthors |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senators Becker, Niezgodski, Bohacek added as coauthors |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senator Delph added as coauthor |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor |
2018-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senators Bassler, Ford and Koch |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2018/bills/senate/275/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/e/9/7fe94425/SB0275.01.INTR.pdf |