IN SB0272 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 15 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-15 - Returned to the Senate with amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 15 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-15 - Returned to the Senate with amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Prescription products.
Title
Prescription products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House - Roll Call 490 (Y: 78 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
House - House - Roll Call 490 (Y: 78 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2013-04-15 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 490: yeas 78, nays 14 |
2013-04-11 | House | Amendment 1 (Lehman), failed; Division of the House: yeas 22, nays 70 |
2013-04-11 | House | Amendment 4 (Clere), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-11 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-04-09 | House | Representatives Davisson, Candelaria Reardon and Shackleford added as cosponsors |
2013-04-09 | House | Representative Clere added as sponsor |
2013-04-09 | House | Representative Davisson removed as sponsor |
2013-04-08 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-03-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2013-02-25 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Davisson |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 185: yeas 50 and nays 0 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Amendment 3 (Pat Miller), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Reread second time: amended and ordered engrossed |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as second author |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Placed back on second reading |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment 1 (Pat Miller), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pat Miller |