IN SB0271 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Public Law 155
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Public Law 155
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Small modular nuclear reactors. Amends the statute governing certificates of public convenience and necessity (certificates) that are issued by the Indiana utility regulatory commission (IURC) for the construction, lease, or purchase of electric generation facilities to require the IURC, in consultation with the department of environmental management (department), to adopt rules concerning the granting of certificates for the construction, purchase, or lease of small modular nuclear reactors: (1) in Indiana for the generation of electricity to be used to furnish public utility service to Indiana customers; or (2) at the site of a nuclear energy production or generating facility that supplies electricity to Indiana retail customers on July 1, 2011. Requires the IURC to adopt the rules not later than July 1, 2023. Provides that the rules adopted by the IURC must provide that in acting on a public utility's petition for a certificate for one or more small modular nuclear reactors, the IURC shall consider the following: (1) Whether, and to what extent, the one or more small modular nuclear reactors proposed by the public utility will replace a loss of generating capacity in the public utility's portfolio resulting from the retirement or planned retirement of one or more of existing electric generating facilities that: (A) are located in Indiana; and (B) use coal or natural gas as a fuel source. (2) Whether one or more of the small modular nuclear reactors will be located on the same site as or near the facility to be retired and, if so, potential opportunities for the public utility to: (A) make use of any land and existing infrastructure or facilities already owned or under the control of the public utility; or (B) create new employment opportunities for workers who have been, or would be, displaced as a result of the retirement of the existing facility. Provides that the IURC's rules must provide that the IURC may grant a certificate under circumstances and for locations other than these. Sets forth additional requirements for small modular nuclear reactors that must be included in the IURC's rules, including the requirement that the owner or operator of a proposed small modular nuclear reactor must provide evidence of a plan to apply for all licenses or permits to construct or operate the proposed small modular nuclear reactor required by the United States Nuclear Regulatory Commission, the department, or any other relevant state or federal regulatory agency. Amends the statute providing certain financial incentives for energy utilities that invest in clean energy projects by providing that, for purposes of the statute, a "clean energy project" and a "nuclear energy production or generating facility" include a small modular nuclear reactor that is constructed after June 30, 2023: (1) in Indiana for the generation of electricity to be used to furnish public utility service to Indiana customers; or (2) at the site of a nuclear energy production or generating facility that supplies electricity to Indiana retail customers on July 1, 2011; under the rules adopted by the IURC under the bill. Defines "small modular nuclear reactor" for purposes of the bill's provisions.
Title
Small modular nuclear reactors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Senate | Public Law 155 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-02-23 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2022-02-22 | House | Representatives Ellington and Frye added as cosponsors |
2022-02-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 256: yeas 70, nays 22 |
2022-02-21 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-15 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-02-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as coauthor |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senators Leising, Busch, Baldwin, Ford Jon, Kruse, Buck, Gaskill, Boots, Tomes, Walker K, Raatz, Donato, Holdman, Charbonneau, Perfect, Rogers, Young M, Bassler, Sandlin, Walker G, Glick, Zay, Crider, Freeman added as coauthors |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Lehman |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Soliday |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 118: yeas 39, nays 9 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as second author |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Koch |