IN SB0266 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-21 - Public Law 173
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-21 - Public Law 173
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of child services matters. Provides that an individual may be employed by a child care provider before the state-mandated criminal history check of the individual is completed if the following conditions are satisfied: (1) The individual's: (A) fingerprint-based check of national crime information data bases; (B) national sex offender registry check; (C) in-state local criminal records check; and (D) in-state child protection index check; have been completed. (2) If the individual has resided outside Indiana at any time during the five years preceding the individual's date of hire, the individual's: (A) out-of-state child abuse registry check; and (B) out-of-state local criminal records check; have been requested. (3) The individual's employment before the completion of the state-mandated criminal history check is limited to training during which the individual: (A) does not have contact with children who are under the care and control of the child care provider; and (B) does not have access to records containing information regarding children who are under the care and control of the child care provider. (4) The individual completes an attestation, under penalty of perjury, disclosing: (A) any abuse or neglect complaints made against the individual with the child welfare agency of a state other than Indiana in which the individual resided within the five years preceding the date of the attestation; and (B) any contact the individual had with a law enforcement agency in connection with the individual's suspected or alleged commission of a crime in a state other than Indiana in which the individual resided within the five years preceding the date of the attestation. Establishes a process by which a child caring institution, group home, licensed child placing agency, or secure private facility (child services providers) may request a review of base rates and other cost-based rates approved by the department of child services (department).
Title
Department of child services matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Amendment #1 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 35 N: 57 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 12 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Amendment #1 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 35 N: 57 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 12 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Senate | Public Law 173 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-08 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 374: yeas 92, nays 1 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 356: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2022-03-08 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2022-03-08 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Rogers and Qaddoura |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Ford Jon and Ford J.D. |
2022-03-02 | House | House advisors appointed: Slager, Rowray, Lehman and Hamilton |
2022-03-02 | House | House conferees appointed: Jeter and Summers |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Concurrence withdrawn |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2022-03-01 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2022-02-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 303: yeas 67, nays 30 |
2022-02-24 | House | Amendment #1 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 277: yeas 35, nays 57 |
2022-02-24 | House | Amendment #7 (Jeter) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-02-24 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-02-21 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-08 | House | Representatives Goodrich and Young J added as cosponsors |
2022-02-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative DeVon |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Jeter |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 117: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senator Crider added as coauthor |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senator Boehnlein added as coauthor |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as coauthor |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 87: yeas 12, nays 35 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senators Ford J.D., Qaddoura, Donato added as coauthors |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senator Brown L added as coauthor |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senator Bassler added as coauthor |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as coauthor |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senator Garten added as third author |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as second author |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ford Jon |