IN SB0265 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Public Law 122
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Public Law 122
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Study of intersection safety. Urges the legislative council to assign to a study committee the task of studying safety at certain intersections not controlled by a traffic signal and drainage along rural roads.
Title
Study of intersection safety. Urges the legislative council to assign to a study committee the task of studying safety at certain intersections not controlled by a traffic signal and drainage along rural roads.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Rep. Robert Cherry [R] | Rep. Edmond Soliday [R] |
Rep. Terry Goodin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Senate | Public Law 122 |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 378: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2018-02-21 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2018-02-20 | House | Representative Goodin added as cosponsor |
2018-02-20 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 201: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2018-02-19 | House | Representative Soliday added as cosponsor |
2018-02-19 | House | Amendment #1 (Cherry) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-02-19 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-02-15 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as second author |
2018-01-30 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Cherry |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 105: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crider |