IN SB0261 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Employment, Labor and Pensions
Pending: House Employment, Labor and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Employment, Labor and Pensions
Pending: House Employment, Labor and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes public agencies to employ construction managers as constructors for certain construction projects. Provides that the statute expires July 1, 2019.
Title
Construction managers as constructors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce, Economic Development & Technology - Roll Call 026101 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce, Economic Development & Technology - Roll Call 026101 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative T. Brown added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Truitt added sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 166: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as coauthor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-02-03 | Senate | SB 261 Amendment #3 (Hershman), prevailed. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | SB 261 Amendment #2 (Hershman), prevailed. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Committee report: do pass amend, adopted. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Commerce, Economic Development & Technology |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hershman, Banks. |