IN SB0260 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Public Law 108
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Public Law 108
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Circuit court clerk matters. Allows a person who is 16 or 17 years of age to serve as a precinct election officer without the written approval of the school principal if school is not in session on election day. Provides that such individuals may: (1) serve as certain election officers, both before and on election day; (2) provide assistance to election officers and in the preparation of absentee ballots; and (3) be appointed to fill a vacancy that occurs on a precinct election board. Provides that a precinct may be established with fewer than 600 active voters if establishing the precinct would avoid establishing a split precinct. Permits a county to submit a proposed precinct boundary change to the election division for review using a module of the statewide voter registration system ("the computerized list") while retaining the option under current law to submit this change by paper. Provides a method for a county to correct any errors or discrepancies in the boundary lines of precincts as depicted in information provided by the U.S. Bureau of the Census in conjunction with state redistricting. Repeals an obsolete statute relating to establishing precincts. Provides that a school that is used as a polling place may on election day: (1) conduct a virtual instruction day for students who attend school in the school building; or (2) conduct in-person instruction to students who attend school in the school building if certain conditions are met. Establishes a procedure for casting a voter's ballot at an early voting site by election workers if the voter does not complete the procedures for casting the voter's ballot. Provides that absentee ballots may be scanned, but not tabulated, not earlier than seven days before election day. Sets forth requirements for processing absentee ballots before election day. Requires retraction of a previously scanned absentee ballot card of a voter who is later found disqualified or whose ballot may not be counted for other statutory reasons. Eliminates the requirement that the alcohol and tobacco commission distributes a registry of permits to the circuit court clerks. Eliminates the requirement that notice of certain alcohol and tobacco commission hearings be given to the circuit court clerk.
Title
Circuit court clerk matters.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Rep. Timothy Wesco [R] | Rep. Ethan Manning [R] |
Rep. Edward Clere [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Pierce) failed (Y: 36 N: 52 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-03-22 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Pryor) prevailed (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Pryor) failed (Y: 27 N: 63 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-03-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Pierce) failed (Y: 36 N: 52 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-03-22 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Pryor) prevailed (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Pryor) failed (Y: 27 N: 63 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-03-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | Senate | Public Law 108 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 320: yeas 37, nays 11 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2021-03-24 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2021-03-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 294: yeas 58, nays 36 |
2021-03-22 | House | Amendment #1 (Pierce) failed; Roll Call 279: yeas 36, nays 52 |
2021-03-22 | House | Amendment #3 (Pryor) prevailed; Roll Call 278: yeas 87, nays 3 |
2021-03-22 | House | Amendment #2 (Pryor) failed; Roll Call 277: yeas 27, nays 63 |
2021-03-22 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-03-02 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Manning and Clere |
2021-02-15 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Wesco |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 110: yeas 32, nays 14 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as second author |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Authored by Senator Walker G |