IN SB0256 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-20 - Representative Kersey added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-20 - Representative Kersey added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Benjamin Harrison conservation trust. Makes nonvoting members of the Indiana Heritage Trust project committee voting members. Makes conforming changes. Makes nonvoting members of the Indiana White River State Park Development Commission voting members. Makes conforming changes.
Title
Benjamin Harrison conservation trust. Makes nonvoting members of the Indiana Heritage Trust project committee voting members. Makes conforming changes. Makes nonvoting members of the Indiana White River State Park Development Commission voting members. Makes conforming changes.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Tallian [D] | Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Rep. Sean Eberhart [R] | Rep. Linda Lawson [D] |
Rep. Ryan Dvorak [D] | Rep. Clyde Kersey [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | House | Representative Kersey added as cosponsor |
2017-03-20 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as second author |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senator Messmer removed as coauthor |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Lawson and Dvorak |
2017-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Eberhart |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 67: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as coauthor |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Tallian |