IN SB0255 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Public Law 52
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expungement. Specifies that a "criminal history provider" includes certain persons who regularly publish criminal history information on the Internet, for purposes of the law requiring criminal history providers to periodically review their criminal history records for expunged convictions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expungement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - House - House Floor - (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15SenatePublic Law 52
2021-04-15SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-04-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-07HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-05SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-03-31HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2021-03-30HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 332: yeas 89, nays 4
2021-03-29HouseAmendment #1 (Errington) ruled out of order
2021-03-29HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-25HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-03-02HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2021-02-05SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-04SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2021-02-02SenateSenator Young M added as second author
2021-02-02SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Young J
2021-02-02SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 52: yeas 46, nays 1
2021-02-01SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-28SenateSenator Taylor G added as coauthor
2021-01-28SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2021-01-11SenateAuthored by Senator Freeman

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/255/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/b/1/3db17723/SB0255.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/4/0/a/740a2e31/SB0255.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/5/3/5953b7e2/SB0255.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/8/d/a/18da915b/SB0255.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/a/b/8/3ab84b8d/SB0255.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/7/7/a9772aad/SB0255.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/d/3/50d38289/SB0255.04.ENRH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/9/6/dd9664f4/SB0255.03.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/6/a/a56af4d2/SB0255.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/6/3/8/06389bd6/SB0255.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/f/7/1/bf71bd5e/SB0255.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/3/d/883d9a3b/SB0255.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/1/b/d51bb380/SB0255.02.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/6/b/a16bdf16/SB0255.02.COMS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/9/1/6c91d196/SB0255.03.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/c/f/facf521a/SB0255.03.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/b/c/68bc4a25/SB0255.03.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/4/9/9e49a9cd/SB0255.04.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/c/5/c/0c5cecf0/SB0255.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/f/b/69fb6eef/SB0255.52_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/9/f/469f60b6/SB0255.02.COMS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/6/8/7168faf1/SB0255.332_H.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback