IN SB0255 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Government and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Government and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Cultural district development. Provides that an arts and cultural district certified by the Indiana arts commission is subject to annual review by the commission and must be recertified every four years. Specifies certain requirements for certification (or recertification) of a district.
Title
Cultural district development. Provides that an arts and cultural district certified by the Indiana arts commission is subject to annual review by the commission and must be recertified every four years. Specifies certain requirements for certification (or recertification) of a district.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Mark Stoops [D] |
Sen. Greg Taylor [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Holli Sullivan [R] | Rep. Tonya Pfaff [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-04 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Pfaff |
2019-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Sullivan |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 64: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Ford Jon) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Taylor G added as coauthor |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Buck added as third author |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as second author |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ford Jon |