IN SB0250 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 186
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Petition carriers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Petition carriers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 186
2013-05-07SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-25HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-18SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 494: yeas 43, nays 0
2013-04-17SenateMotion to concur in House amendments filed
2013-03-21HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2013-03-21HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 314: yeas 93, nays 0
2013-03-19HouseAmendment 1 (M. Smith), prevailed; voice vote
2013-03-19HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-03-18HouseRepresentatives Goodin and Richardson added as cosponsors
2013-03-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
2013-01-24SenateCosponsor: Rep. M. Smith
2013-01-24SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Burton
2013-01-24SenateReferred to the House
2013-01-24SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 23: yeas 46 and nays 0
2013-01-22SenateSenator Lanane added as second author
2013-01-22SenateAmendment 1 (Walker), prevailed; voice vote
2013-01-22SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-01-17SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-01-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Elections
2013-01-07SenateAuthored by Senator Walker

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback