IN SB0249 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 70
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 70
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exploitation of dependents and endangered adults. Defines "person in a position of trust" and "self-dealing". Provides that a: (1) person commits exploitation of a dependent or an endangered adult if the person recklessly uses or exerts control over the personal services or property of an endangered adult or dependent; and (2) person in a position of trust commits exploitation of a dependent or an endangered adult if the person recklessly engages in self-dealing with the property of the dependent or endangered adult. Increases the penalty if the person has a prior unrelated conviction. Removes: (1) provisions relating to the Social Security Act; (2) a sentencing enhancement that applies if the victim is at least 60 years of age; and (3) a sentencing enhancement based on the value of the property.
Title
Exploitation of dependents and endangered adults.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Public Law 70 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-02-26 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2020-02-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 211: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2020-02-24 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-11 | House | Representatives Lehman and Speedy added as cosponsors |
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Crane added as coauthor |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senators Becker and Leising added as coauthors |
2020-01-27 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative McNamara |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 61: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Tallian) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Second reading: call withdrawn |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Senator Koch added as second author |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor |
2020-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Young M |