IN SB0248 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Distributions of public safety income tax revenue. Requires the distribution of public safety local income tax revenues to a township that provides fire protection or emergency medical services (other than a township in Marion County). Permits a qualified fire protection territory and a qualified fire protection district (other than in Marion County) to be eligible to receive distributions of public safety local income tax revenues.
Title
Distributions of public safety income tax revenue. Requires the distribution of public safety local income tax revenues to a township that provides fire protection or emergency medical services (other than a township in Marion County). Permits a qualified fire protection territory and a qualified fire protection district (other than in Marion County) to be eligible to receive distributions of public safety local income tax revenues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Aylesworth |
2019-02-19 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Cherry |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 153: yeas 36, nays 4 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Merritt) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Niemeyer) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Niemeyer) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as second author |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Niemeyer |