IN SB0240 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Law 66
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Law 66
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Terrorism. Repeals and replaces in a new article the offense of: (1) possession, use, or manufacture of a weapon of mass destruction; (2) agricultural terrorism; (3) terroristic mischief; and (4) terroristic deception. Specifies that "terrorism" includes the unlawful threat or use of force to affect the conduct of a government. Makes providing material support to a terrorist a Level 5 felony, and increases the penalty to a Level 2 felony if the material support includes the commission of a felony or if the act of terrorism is reasonably likely to cause serious bodily injury to another person. Makes concealing or harboring a person who has committed a terrorist act a Level 6 felony, and increases the penalty to a Level 3 felony if the terrorist act resulted in serious bodily injury or death. Makes committing a criminal offense with the intent to benefit a terrorist organization or to increase the person's standing in a terrorist organization a Level 5 felony, and increases the penalty to a Level 3 felony if the offense involves the unlawful use of a firearm or a weapon of mass destruction. Provides that a person who commits an offense with the intent to assist another person in the commission of a felony terrorist offense is subject to an additional sentence enhancement equal to the sentence imposed for the underlying offense.
Specifies that a person commits intimidation if: (1) the threatening communication places a person in fear that certain threats will be carried out; or (2) if the threatening communication is made to a person other than the person who is the subject of the threat. Enhances the penalty for intimidation if the threat relates to a person's occupation. Defines "police radio mobile application" as an application installed on a mobile device that allows a person to listen to the contents of traffic carried on police radio frequencies. Provides that a person who possesses or uses a police radio mobile application: (1) while committing a crime; (2) to further the commission of a crime; or (3) to avoid detection by a law enforcement agency; commits unlawful use of a police radio, a Class B misdemeanor.
Title
Terrorism. Repeals and replaces in a new article the offense of: (1) possession, use, or manufacture of a weapon of mass destruction; (2) agricultural terrorism; (3) terroristic mischief; and (4) terroristic deception. Specifies that "terrorism" includes the unlawful threat or use of force to affect the conduct of a government. Makes providing material support to a terrorist a Level 5 felony, and increases the penalty to a Level 2 felony if the material support includes the commission of a felony or if the act of terrorism is reasonably likely to cause serious bodily injury to another person. Makes concealing or harboring a person who has committed a terrorist act a Level 6 felony, and increases the penalty to a Level 3 felony if the terrorist act resulted in serious bodily injury or death. Makes committing a criminal offense with the intent to benefit a terrorist organization or to increase the person's standing in a terrorist organization a Level 5 felony, and increases the penalty to a Level 3 felony if the offense involves the unlawful use of a firearm or a weapon of mass destruction. Provides that a person who commits an offense with the intent to assist another person in the commission of a felony terrorist offense is subject to an additional sentence enhancement equal to the sentence imposed for the underlying offense.
Specifies that a person commits intimidation if: (1) the threatening communication places a person in fear that certain threats will be carried out; or (2) if the threatening communication is made to a person other than the person who is the subject of the threat. Enhances the penalty for intimidation if the threat relates to a person's occupation. Defines "police radio mobile application" as an application installed on a mobile device that allows a person to listen to the contents of traffic carried on police radio frequencies. Provides that a person who possesses or uses a police radio mobile application: (1) while committing a crime; (2) to further the commission of a crime; or (3) to avoid detection by a law enforcement agency; commits unlawful use of a police radio, a Class B misdemeanor.
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. John Crane [R] | Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] |
Rep. Chris Chyung [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Public Law 66 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 363: yeas 45, nays 1 |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2019-03-27 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2019-03-26 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 351: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2019-03-25 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Representative Chyung added as cosponsor |
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senator Leising added as coauthor |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senator Crane added as coauthor |
2019-02-14 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative McNamara |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 122: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senator Koch added as coauthor |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senator Sandlin added as third author |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as second author |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senator Bohacek removed as coauthor |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Freeman) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as coauthor |
2019-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Freeman |