IN SB0239 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Public Law 128
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Public Law 128
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Practitioner advertising. Provides that, beginning January 1, 2023, certain practitioners are subject to disciplinary sanctions if the practitioner communicates or disseminates to the general public an advertisement that includes deceptive or misleading information or does not prominently state the profession or license held by the practitioner. Establishes certain exceptions. Provides, for purposes of the law prohibiting the unlawful practice of medicine or osteopathic medicine, that "the practice of medicine or osteopathic medicine" includes attaching to an individual's name additional terms or other specified words that identify a member of a medical specialty. Establishes certain exceptions. Specifies that the exclusions to the practice of medicine and osteopathic medicine do not allow a person to use words or abbreviations that indicate or induce an individual to believe that the person is engaged in the practice of medicine or osteopathic medicine.
Title
Practitioner advertising.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Public Law 128 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 346: yeas 40, nays 10 |
2022-03-07 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 356: yeas 88, nays 6 |
2022-03-07 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2022-03-07 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Boehnlein and Melton |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Brown L and Ford J.D. |
2022-02-28 | House | Representative Jordan added as advisor |
2022-02-28 | House | Representative Barrett added as conferee |
2022-02-28 | House | Representative Zent removed as conferee |
2022-02-28 | House | Representative Barrett removed as advisor |
2022-02-28 | House | House advisors appointed: Barrett, Lehe and Shackleford |
2022-02-28 | House | House conferees appointed: Zent and Fleming |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2022-02-25 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2022-02-24 | House | Representative Fleming added as cosponsor |
2022-02-24 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 271: yeas 84, nays 1 |
2022-02-23 | House | Amendment #2 (Zent) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-02-23 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-02-22 | House | Representatives Jordan and Barrett added as cosponsors |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Zent |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 162: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senator Pol added as coauthor |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Boehnlein) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senator Brown L added as second author |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senator Brown L removed as coauthor |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senators Leising, Brown L, Becker, Yoder added as coauthors |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Senator Melton added as coauthor |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boehnlein |