IN SB0239 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Property tax assessment appeals. Repeals a statute requiring the Indiana board of tax review (board) to recommend that parties settle or mediate any case pending before the board if certain conditions are met. Provides that certain burden shifting requirements do not apply if the assessment that is the subject of the review or appeal is based on substantial renovations or new improvements. Provides that "small claim" means an appeal where the parties have elected to proceed under the board's small claims rules. (Current law defines the term as an appeal of a final determination of assessed valuation that does not
Title
Property tax assessment appeals. Repeals a statute requiring the Indiana board of tax review (board) to recommend that parties settle or mediate any case pending before the board if certain conditions are met. Provides that certain burden shifting requirements do not apply if the assessment that is the subject of the review or appeal is based on substantial renovations or new improvements. Provides that "small claim" means an appeal where the parties have elected to proceed under the board's small claims rules. (Current law defines the term as an appeal of a final determination of assessed valuation that does not
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Michael Young [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Mike Speedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senators Kruse and Young M added as coauthors |
2019-02-25 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Speedy |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 184: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as second author |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Freeman |