IN SB0234 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Public Law 59
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Public Law 59
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the auction house license provisions. Provides that a person holding an unexpired auction house license may apply to convert that license to an auction company license. Repeals the temporary auctioneer's permit provisions. Provides that the auctioneer commission may use interest earned from the funds in the auctioneer recovery fund for expenses related to the continuing education program and other expenses incurred by the commission. Allows the auctioneer commission to hire an education officer to oversee and perform the educational duties required under the auctioneer licensing laws. Makes conforming changes. Makes a technical correction.
Title
Auctioneer licensing.
Sponsors
Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] | Sen. Rick Niemeyer [R] |
Rep. Charles Burton [R] | Rep. Kreg Battles [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - House - House Floor - (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions - Roll Call 023404 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce, Economic Development & Technology - Roll Call 023401 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions - Roll Call 023404 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce, Economic Development & Technology - Roll Call 023401 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Senate | Public Law 59 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-02-24 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2014-02-24 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 252: yeas 96 and nays 0 |
2014-02-20 | House | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-18 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Representative Battles added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Representative Burton added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Representative Niemeyer added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Representative Wolkins added sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 109: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as coauthor. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | SB 234 Amendment #1 (Kruse), prevailed. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senator Buck added as second author. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Commerce, Economic Development & Technology |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kruse. |