IN SB0233 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Public Law 13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Public Law 13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Foster parent bill of rights. Requires the department of child services (department), in collaboration with: (1) current foster parents; (2) child placing agencies; and (3) other individuals and organizations with expertise in foster care services; to develop and update a statement of the rights of a foster parent. Requires that the statement of the rights of a foster parent summarize the rights and responsibilities of a foster parent. Requires the department to distribute and publish on the department's Internet web site the statement of the rights of a foster parent.
Title
Foster parent bill of rights. Requires the department of child services (department), in collaboration with: (1) current foster parents; (2) child placing agencies; and (3) other individuals and organizations with expertise in foster care services; to develop and update a statement of the rights of a foster parent. Requires that the statement of the rights of a foster parent summarize the rights and responsibilities of a foster parent. Requires the department to distribute and publish on the department's Internet web site the statement of the rights of a foster parent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Public Law 13 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-02-21 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2018-02-20 | House | Representative Zent added as cosponsor |
2018-02-20 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 199: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2018-02-19 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-15 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-13 | House | Representative Macer added as cosponsor |
2018-02-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senator Crane added as coauthor |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senator Head added as coauthor |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Frizzell |
2018-01-25 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative McNamara |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 71: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Senators Zay, Holdman, Becker added as coauthors |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as coauthor |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as third author |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as second author |
2018-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ford |