IN SB0230 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 65
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 65
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Leasing of local unit property. Provides that a political subdivision may lease real property of the political subdivision that is located between the curb of a street and the front of commercial property, including a parkway strip, tree row, verge, or sidewalk, to the owner or property manager of the commercial property: (1) upon terms agreed to between the political subdivision and the property owner or property manager; and (2) without competitive bidding. Specifies requirements for the lease. Provides that upon execution of the lease, the property of the political subdivision shall be under the maintenance, control, and supervision of the property owner or the property manager, subject to the public's right to use the sidewalk as a walkway. Requires the lessee to: (1) assume the liability of the political subdivision for personal injuries and property damage to third parties occurring on the property; and (2) maintain insurance coverage in amount determined sufficient by the political subdivision. Requires the lease to be approved by at least a two-thirds vote of the members of the fiscal body of the political subdivision and recorded in the office of the county recorder.
Title
Leasing of local unit property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Public Law 65 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-03 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2020-03-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 235: yeas 87, nays 0 |
2020-02-27 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-24 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Burton |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 78: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Buck added as second author |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Sandlin) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sandlin |