IN SB0229 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - Senators Breaux and Ford J.D. added as coauthors
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Psychotropic medication in foster care. Requires Medicaid restrictions on mental health drugs if: (1) federal financial participation is not available for reimbursement for the prescription; or (2) the child is under the care and supervision of the department of child services (department). Beginning January 1, 2020, requires the department to employ or contract with consultants who are licensed child and adolescent psychiatrists to review and provide written determinations and recommendations for each request to administer psychotropic medication to a child under the care and supervision of the department. Requires the department to: (1) approve a request for consent of a psychotropic medication if the consultant determines the requested psychotropic medication is appropriate and recommends approval of the request; and (2) deny a request for consent of a psychotropic medication if the consultant recommends denial of consent for the psychotropic medication. Sets forth time frames for review of the request for consent concerning psychotropic medication. Requires the department to develop a report to quarterly monitor prescriptions of psychotropic medication for children under the care and supervision of the department and provide the report to the mental health Medicaid quality advisory committee. Requires residential child care entities licensed by the department to: (1) obtain written instructions and consents before providing psychotropic medication to a child; and (2) maintain a record of information regarding the administration of psychotropic medication to a child. Allows for psychotropic medication to be administered without consent of the department in an emergency under specified circumstances and requires consent to be requested within 24 hours of the administration of the initial dose of medication.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Psychotropic medication in foster care. Requires Medicaid restrictions on mental health drugs if: (1) federal financial participation is not available for reimbursement for the prescription; or (2) the child is under the care and supervision of the department of child services (department). Beginning January 1, 2020, requires the department to employ or contract with consultants who are licensed child and adolescent psychiatrists to review and provide written determinations and recommendations for each request to administer psychotropic medication to a child under the care and supervision of the department. Requires the department to: (1) approve a request for consent of a psychotropic medication if the consultant determines the requested psychotropic medication is appropriate and recommends approval of the request; and (2) deny a request for consent of a psychotropic medication if the consultant recommends denial of consent for the psychotropic medication. Sets forth time frames for review of the request for consent concerning psychotropic medication. Requires the department to develop a report to quarterly monitor prescriptions of psychotropic medication for children under the care and supervision of the department and provide the report to the mental health Medicaid quality advisory committee. Requires residential child care entities licensed by the department to: (1) obtain written instructions and consents before providing psychotropic medication to a child; and (2) maintain a record of information regarding the administration of psychotropic medication to a child. Allows for psychotropic medication to be administered without consent of the department in an emergency under specified circumstances and requires consent to be requested within 24 hours of the administration of the initial dose of medication.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12SenateSenators Breaux and Ford J.D. added as coauthors
2019-02-12SenateSenator Houchin added as third author
2019-02-12SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-11SenateSenator Ford Jon added as second author
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Grooms

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback