IN SB0228 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 218
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Department of health matters. Allows the state health commissioner to issue standing orders (current law allows for statewide standing orders) and sets forth requirements of a standing order. Removes the requirement that the state department of health (state department) adopt rules defining a birth problem. Requires the state department to publish a list annually of birth problems required to be reported and allows for the state department to update the list. Adds considerations by the state department in compiling the birth problem list. Allows the state department to release information in the immunization data registry to the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention. Requires the state department to publish a list of reportable communicable diseases and other diseases and conditions that are a danger to health and to publish the list of control measures for the diseases and conditions on the state department's Internet web site. Sets forth considerations in updating the list of communicable diseases and conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of health matters. Allows the state health commissioner to issue standing orders (current law allows for statewide standing orders) and sets forth requirements of a standing order. Removes the requirement that the state department of health (state department) adopt rules defining a birth problem. Requires the state department to publish a list annually of birth problems required to be reported and allows for the state department to update the list. Adds considerations by the state department in compiling the birth problem list. Allows the state department to release information in the immunization data registry to the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention. Requires the state department to publish a list of reportable communicable diseases and other diseases and conditions that are a danger to health and to publish the list of control measures for the diseases and conditions on the state department's Internet web site. Sets forth considerations in updating the list of communicable diseases and conditions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-05SenatePublic Law 218
2019-05-05SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-18SenateConference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 539: yeas 44, nays 0
2019-04-18HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 561: yeas 91, nays 0
2019-04-16HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2019-04-16SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2019-04-08HouseHouse advisors appointed: Davisson, Manning, Hatfield and Shackleford
2019-04-08HouseHouse conferees appointed: Kirchhofer and Fleming
2019-04-04SenateSenate advisors appointed: Crider and Stoops
2019-04-04SenateSenate conferees appointed: Charbonneau and Breaux
2019-04-01SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2019-04-01SenateMotion to dissent filed
2019-03-27HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-03-26HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 350: yeas 94, nays 0
2019-03-25HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-21HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2019-01-30SenateReferred to the House
2019-01-29SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2019-01-29SenateCosponsor: Representative Fleming
2019-01-29SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Kirchhofer
2019-01-29SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 45: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-01-28SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-24SenateSenator Crider added as second author
2019-01-24SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Charbonneau

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/228/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/4/7/3847c808/SB0228.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/5/3/ff53207b/SB0228.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/f/b/1/bfb10170/SB0228.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/6/4/a/f64aa420/SB0228.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/f/5/5bf51b93/SB0228.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/0/c/6/70c6c91c/SB0228.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/f/0/3ef05dab/SB0228.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/2/4/9/9249d2bd/SB0228.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/1/7/9c17b013/SB0228.45.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/5/1/3/35138df0/SB0228.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/5/d/b05d57b5/SB0228.350.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/6/5/9e658e91/SB0228.539.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/5/6/ff562b2e/SB0228.561.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback