IN SB0226 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
Pending: House Public Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
Pending: House Public Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Correctional officers and possession of handguns. Allows an employee of a penal facility: (1) who is a correctional officer; and (2) whose duties include the daily or ongoing supervision and care of persons who are lawfully detained in the penal facility; to possess not more than one handgun in the correctional officer's vehicle while the vehicle is on the property of the penal facility.
Title
Correctional officers and possession of handguns. Allows an employee of a penal facility: (1) who is a correctional officer; and (2) whose duties include the daily or ongoing supervision and care of persons who are lawfully detained in the penal facility; to possess not more than one handgun in the correctional officer's vehicle while the vehicle is on the property of the penal facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-02-03 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Mahan |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 157: yeas 45, nays 4 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as second author |
2016-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Eckerty |