IN SB0217 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Public Law 95
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Dyslexia. Requires the following: (1) A school multidisciplinary team must include information about dyslexia in a student's educational evaluation if the multidisciplinary team determines that the student is eligible to receive special education and related services and has or has characteristics of dyslexia. (2) Information about dyslexia must be: (A) discussed by the student's case conference committee if information about dyslexia is included in the student's educational evaluation; and (B) included in the student's individualized education program if the case conference committee determines that the information should be included. Provides that a school corporation and charter school's reading plan shall

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dyslexia. Requires the following: (1) A school multidisciplinary team must include information about dyslexia in a student's educational evaluation if the multidisciplinary team determines that the student is eligible to receive special education and related services and has or has characteristics of dyslexia. (2) Information about dyslexia must be: (A) discussed by the student's case conference committee if information about dyslexia is included in the student's educational evaluation; and (B) included in the student's individualized education program if the case conference committee determines that the information should be included. Provides that a school corporation and charter school's reading plan shall

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15SenatePublic Law 95
2018-03-15SenateSigned by the Governor
2018-03-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2018-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2018-03-06SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 341: yeas 49, nays 0
2018-03-05SenateMotion to concur filed
2018-02-28HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2018-02-27HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 234: yeas 95, nays 0
2018-02-26HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2018-02-20HouseRepresentative Errington added as cosponsor
2018-02-20HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2018-02-12HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2018-02-02SenateReferred to the House
2018-02-01SenateSenators Stoops and Doriot added as coauthors
2018-02-01SenateSenator Eckerty added as coauthor
2018-02-01SenateSenator Charbonneau added as coauthor
2018-02-01SenateCosponsors: Representatives Behning and Macer
2018-02-01SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Burton
2018-02-01SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 120: yeas 48, nays 0
2018-01-30SenateAmendment #2 (Houchin) prevailed; voice vote
2018-01-30SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2018-01-29SenateSenator Tomes added as coauthor
2018-01-29SenateSenators Holdman and Sandlin added as coauthors
2018-01-25SenateSenator Melton added as coauthor
2018-01-25SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2018-01-23SenateSenator Raatz added as coauthor
2018-01-22SenateSenators Perfect, Bassler, Walker added as coauthors
2018-01-22SenateSenators Freeman and Crane added as coauthors
2018-01-09SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2018-01-04SenateSenator Bohacek added as coauthor
2018-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2018-01-03SenateAuthored by Senators Houchin, Bray and Ford

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2018/bills/senate/217/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/9/1/79914fc0/SB0217.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/f/0/4/bf04831d/SB0217.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/6/7/0/c6707dd4/SB0217.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/5/1/a5514e73/SB0217.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/9/a/fd9a2cff/SB0217.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/8/c/c/b8cc3c99/SB0217.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/2/4/3/9243f524/SB0217.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/c/1/88c1c0ce/SB0217.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/d/9/eed9ffdd/SB0217.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/e/f/beef6364/SB0217.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/6/0/4660ef2a/SB0217.120.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/2/e/a72e374b/SB0217.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/7/8/87784496/SB0217.234.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/a/4/23a4aa90/SB0217.341.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback