IN SB0211 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Debt collection. Amends the statute concerning deceptive consumer sales as follows: (1) Defines the term "debt buyer". (2) Specifies that a debt buyer is a debt collector for purposes of the statute. (3) Requires a debt collector to make certain disclosures to an Indiana debtor. (4) Provides that the failure to make the required disclosures constitutes a deceptive act under the statute. (5) Specifies that the attorney general's authority to recover a civil penalty not exceeding $1,000 for knowing violations of the provisions concerning debt collection practices applies to each violation of the provisions per consumer, subject to a cap
Title
Debt collection. Amends the statute concerning deceptive consumer sales as follows: (1) Defines the term "debt buyer". (2) Specifies that a debt buyer is a debt collector for purposes of the statute. (3) Requires a debt collector to make certain disclosures to an Indiana debtor. (4) Provides that the failure to make the required disclosures constitutes a deceptive act under the statute. (5) Specifies that the attorney general's authority to recover a civil penalty not exceeding $1,000 for knowing violations of the provisions concerning debt collection practices applies to each violation of the provisions per consumer, subject to a cap
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Civil Law - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Civil Law - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Representative Frizzell added as sponsor |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 94: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as coauthor |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senator Buck added as second author |
2015-01-06 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Miller Patricia |