IN SB0207 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 144: yeas 22, nays 27
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 144: yeas 22, nays 27
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Syringe exchange program. Repeals the expiration date of the syringe exchange program. (Under current law, the expiration date is July 1, 2021.)
Title
Syringe exchange program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 22 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 144: yeas 22, nays 27 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Crider added as second author |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Merritt |