IN SB0203 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 45
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Protection and advocacy services commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protection and advocacy services commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 45
2013-04-12SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-04-03SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-03HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-01SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-03-26HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2013-03-26HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 345: yeas 97, nays 0
2013-03-25HouseRepresentative Summers added as cosponsor
2013-03-25HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-03-21HouseRepresentative Klinker added as cosponsor
2013-03-21HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
2013-02-07SenateSenator Breaux added as coauthor
2013-02-05SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Frizzell
2013-02-05SenateReferred to the House
2013-02-05SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 73: yeas 49 and nays 0
2013-02-04SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-01-31SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2013-01-31SenateSenator Becker added as second author
2013-01-31SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-01-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2013-01-07SenateAuthored by Senator Leising

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback