IN SB0195 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Public Law 95
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Proof of mailing date. Provides that payment mailed to the county treasurer with metered postage is timely received if: (1) the envelope is properly addressed to the principal office of the county treasurer; (2) the envelope has sufficient metered postage from a meter postage provider approved by the United States Postal Service; (3) the metered postage is affixed to the envelope and bears the actual date of when it was affixed and that date is on or before the due date; and (4) the envelope is received by the county treasurer not later than five business days after the due date. Provides that a taxpayer is subject to a penalty of 5% of the amount of delinquent taxes if a payment to the county treasurer is: (1) mailed or deposited with a parcel carrier by the thirtieth day after the due date (the initial penalty period) and the postmark, certificate of delivery, or other evidence indicates the date of the mailing or deposit; or (2) mailed and affixed with a metered postage stamp indicating a date not later than the thirtieth day after the due date and the payment is received by the county treasurer not later than five business days after the thirtieth day after the due date. Provides that if a payment is mailed and received not later than 30 days after the due date without a legible post mark, the person is considered to have made the payment by the thirtieth day after the due date, if the person can show by reasonable evidence that the payment was timely mailed. Provides that if a payment is mailed or sent by parcel carrier but not received by the thirtieth day after the due date, the person is considered to have made the payment by the thirtieth day after the due date, if the person can show by reasonable evidence that the payment was timely mailed and makes a duplicate payment within 30 days after the person is notified that the payment was not received.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proof of mailing date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22SenatePublic Law 95
2021-04-22SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-04-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-01SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 314: yeas 48, nays 0
2021-03-29SenateMotion to concur filed
2021-03-17HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2021-03-16HouseRepresentative Zent added as cosponsor
2021-03-16HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 270: yeas 97, nays 1
2021-03-15HouseRepresentative Pryor added as cosponsor
2021-03-15HouseAmendment #1 (Barrett) prevailed; voice vote
2021-03-15HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-03-11HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-03-01HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2021-02-03SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-02SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Barrett
2021-02-02SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 49: yeas 47, nays 0
2021-02-01SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-28SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-25SenateSenators Gaskill and Rogers added as coauthors
2021-01-14SenateSenator Kruse added as second author
2021-01-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2021-01-05SenateAuthored by Senator Raatz

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/195/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/f/5/4ef5d164/SB0195.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/6/a/326a1d04/SB0195.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/2/0/5920f49a/SB0195.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/1/e/7/31e75d0f/SB0195.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/4/1/6/9416aeb5/SB0195.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/6/e/4a6eb438/SB0195.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/1/1/c31159e3/SB0195.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/5/7/b/357b2d8d/SB0195.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/c/9/2/ac92ca1c/SB0195.05.ENRH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/a/5/89a591a6/SB0195.03.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/8/8/a68813cb/SB0195.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/6/2/6b620952/SB0195.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/f/a/d/bfad28fa/SB0195.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/7/7/0/f7707c50/SB0195.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/7/d/e97d7377/SB0195.02.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/5/3/dc530c4d/SB0195.02.COMS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/d/1/e/1d1ecaa6/SB0195.03.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/4/0/494020c3/SB0195.04.ENGH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/b/2/f/8b2f6424/SB0195.04.ENGH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/d/8/9ed8febf/SB0195.04.ENGH.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/7/e/f97ece54/SB0195.05.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/0/3/db03d66a/SB0195.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/0/2/0/d020fe06/SB0195.49_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/7/6/66760b95/SB0195.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/8/0/87802273/SB0195.270_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/6/a/e/86ae08a8/SB0195.314_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback