IN SB0190 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Waiver of penalties and interest. Provides that the fiscal body of a county may adopt an ordinance to establish a property tax amnesty program and require a waiver of interest and penalties added before January 1, 2022, on delinquent taxes and special assessments on real property in the county if: (1) all of the delinquent taxes and special assessments on the real property were first due and payable before January 1, 2022; and (2) before November 1, 2023, the taxpayer has paid all of these delinquent taxes and special assessments and has also paid all of the taxes and special assessments that are first due and payable after December 31, 2021. Requires the waiver of interest and penalties in these circumstances, notwithstanding any payment arrangement entered into by the county treasurer and the taxpayer. Provides that the waiver of interest and penalties under a program shall not apply to interest and penalties added to delinquent property tax installments or special assessments on real property that was purchased or sold in any prior tax sale.
Title
Waiver of penalties and interest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senators Buck, Becker, Bassler, Glick added as coauthors |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senators Niemeyer, Raatz, Qaddoura, Rogers, Melton added as coauthors |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as third author |
2022-01-20 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Brown T |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 33: yeas 46, nays 0 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Senator Buchanan added as second author |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holdman |