IN SB0189 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Contributing to delinquency. Provides that the penalty for the crime of contributing to delinquency is a felony one level higher than that of the delinquent act committed by the child, except that: (1) the penalty for inducing a child to commit a Level 1 felony is a Level 1 felony; and (2) the penalty for inducing a child to commit murder is the penalty for murder.
Title
Contributing to delinquency. Provides that the penalty for the crime of contributing to delinquency is a felony one level higher than that of the delinquent act committed by the child, except that: (1) the penalty for inducing a child to commit a Level 1 felony is a Level 1 felony; and (2) the penalty for inducing a child to commit murder is the penalty for murder.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Rep. Thomas Washburne [R] |
Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senator Buck added as third author |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Steuerwald |
2017-02-21 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Washburne |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 149: yeas 41, nays 5 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senator Young M added as second author |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senator Koch added as author |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senator Long removed as author |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2017-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Long |