IN SB0188 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 141
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revised Uniform Unclaimed Property Act. Repeals the unclaimed property act and replaces it with the revised unclaimed property act. Makes conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revised Uniform Unclaimed Property Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29SenatePublic Law 141
2021-04-29SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-04-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-28HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-23SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-21SenateSenator Randolph removed as coauthor
2021-04-21HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 487: yeas 87, nays 0
2021-04-21SenateConference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 468: yeas 46, nays 2
2021-04-20HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2021-04-20SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2021-04-20SenateSenator Freeman added as conferee
2021-04-20SenateSenator Randolph Lonnie M removed as conferee
2021-04-15SenateSenate advisors appointed: Brown L and Lanane
2021-04-15SenateSenate conferees appointed: Koch and Randolph Lonnie M
2021-04-14HouseHouse advisors appointed: Torr, Davis and Bauer M
2021-04-14HouseHouse conferees appointed: Young J and Hatfield
2021-04-14SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2021-04-14SenateMotion to dissent filed
2021-04-14HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2021-04-13HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 424: yeas 91, nays 1
2021-04-08HouseAmendment #1 (Young J) prevailed; voice vote
2021-04-08HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-04-01HousePlaced back on second reading
2021-03-29HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-25HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-02-24SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-23SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Young J
2021-02-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 178: yeas 48, nays 0
2021-02-22SenateAmendment #1 (Koch) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-22SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-02-22SenateSenator Brown L added as second author
2021-02-18SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-02-04SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2021-01-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-05SenateAuthored by Senator Koch

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/188/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/a/4/08a46f98/SB0188.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/5/b/435b96fe/SB0188.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/b/b/dfbb8ca0/SB0188.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/d/b/d/6dbdb64e/SB0188.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/7/6/057663fb/SB0188.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/b/e/7/fbe72d8d/SB0188.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/0/5/1/c051c674/SB0188.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/6/3/e3636155/SB0188.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/8/3/37835fb8/SB0188.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/b/5/a5b5609c/SB0188.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/b/6/e/4b6e8c6c/SB0188.06.ENRH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/9/f/cb9f9e70/SB0188.02.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/d/0/fcd00301/SB0188.04.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/0/4/190467d2/SB0188.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/0/a/1/d0a1b87e/SB0188.01.INTR.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/b/2/46b2aae6/SB0188.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/b/a/dcba10dc/SB0188.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/e/7/dee78b33/SB0188.03.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/e/0/f/2e0f54a1/SB0188.03.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/2/f/ff2f7212/SB0188.03.ENGS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/2/3/8/d238c62d/SB0188.04.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/c/c/f8ccb9f1/SB0188.04.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/d/0/08d03166/SB0188.05.ENGH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/1/c/691c1c47/SB0188.05.ENGH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/3/6/1/5361e3ed/SB0188.05.ENGH.DIS01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/d/9/93d91869/SB0188.06.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/0/6/0f06b520/SB0188.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/9/5/c/c95cc603/SB0188.178_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/7/8/6f78fa9d/SB0188.03.ENGS.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/4/a/464a8994/SB0188.424_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/d/6/f/bd6febf5/SB0188.468_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/8/4/5d8488cb/SB0188.487_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback