IN SB0186 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Public Law 127
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Public Law 127
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of natural resources. Eliminates and renames divisions and bureaus that have been merged by the department of natural resources (department) due to reorganization that occurred within the department. Establishes the Indiana state park inns authority (authority) as a body corporate and politic for the operation, management, and administration of inns and associated facilities by the department. Allows the authority to purchase service credit (subject to certain conditions) for prior service by an employee of the authority. Eliminates the separate hunting license by including a crossbow and bolt in the licensure for archery equipment permitted to be used. Requires the division of fish and wildlife to meet with representatives of certain organizations concerning certain issues and to submit recommendations to the general assembly. Makes conforming changes.
Title
Department of natural resources.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] |
Sen. Kyle Walker [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Sean Eberhart [R] | Rep. David Abbott [R] |
Rep. Carolyn Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Public Law 127 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 337: yeas 49, nays 1 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2022-03-01 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2022-02-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 290: yeas 92, nays 2 |
2022-02-24 | House | Amendment #4 (Wesco) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-02-24 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-02-21 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2022-02-17 | House | Representative Jackson added as cosponsor |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Abbott D |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Eberhart |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 158: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senator Crider added as second author |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senators Boots, Koch, Walker K added as coauthors |
2022-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Glick |