IN SB0184 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-21 - Public Law 136
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-21 - Public Law 136
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Nonprofit agricultural organization coverage. Authorizes a nonprofit agricultural organization to provide health benefit coverage that is: (1) sponsored by the nonprofit agricultural organization or its affiliate; (2) offered only to members of the nonprofit agricultural organization and their families; (3) deemed by the nonprofit agricultural organization to be important in assisting its members to live long and productive lives; and (4) offered in every county in Indiana. Provides that nonprofit agricultural organization coverage is not insurance and is not subject to the regulatory authority of the department of insurance, and that a nonprofit agricultural organization providing health coverage is not engaged in the business of insurance and is not required to obtain a certificate of authority. Provides that an individual may not apply for health coverage provided by a nonprofit agricultural organization until the individual has been a member of the nonprofit agricultural organization for at least 30 days. Mandates that the health coverage cover ambulatory patient services, hospitalization, emergency services, and laboratory services, and provides that the coverage may not be subject to an annual limit of less than $2,000,000 per year. Requires a nonprofit agricultural organization offering health coverage: (1) to annually file with the department of insurance a written, signed opinion of a qualified actuary that the plan reserves of the nonprofit agricultural organization and its affiliate are adequate and conform to the appropriate actuarial standards of practice; and (2) to reinsure all or a portion of its risks. Provides that an individual entering into a health coverage contract with a nonprofit agricultural organization must acknowledge in a signed writing that the coverage: (1) is not considered insurance; and (2) is not subject to the administrative rules of the department of insurance.
Title
Nonprofit agricultural organization coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-21 | Senate | Public Law 136 |
2020-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 379: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Dissent rescinded |
2020-03-09 | House | House advisors appointed: Prescott, Carbaugh, Barrett, Austin, Bauer and Campbell |
2020-03-09 | House | House conferees appointed: Manning and Wright |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Zay, Breaux and Leising |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Charbonneau and Ford J.D. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Concurrence withdrawn |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2020-03-04 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2020-03-03 | House | Representative Austin added as cosponsor |
2020-03-03 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2020-03-03 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 275: yeas 94, nays 2 |
2020-03-02 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senators Messmer, Niemeyer, Walker, Bassler, Gaskill, Sandlin, Rogers, Ford J.D., Kruse, Raatz, Glick, Spartz, Doriot, Koch, Breaux added as coauthors |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senator Walker removed as coauthor |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senator Sandlin removed as coauthor |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senator Rogers removed as coauthor |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senator Niemeyer removed as coauthor |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senator Gaskill removed as coauthor |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. removed as coauthor |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senator Bassler removed as coauthor |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Carbaugh, Barrett, Prescott |
2020-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Manning |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 142: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as coauthor |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Ford J.D.) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senators Bassler, Gaskill, Sandlin added as coauthors |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Walker added as coauthor |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senator Niemeyer added as coauthor |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senator Leising added as third author |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senator Zay added as second author |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Authored by Senator Charbonneau |