IN SB0177 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Public Law 34
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Public Law 34
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School board candidate filing deadline. Changes the time frame that a candidate for a school board office is required to file the candidate's petition of nomination. Modifies deadlines concerning a statement questioning the validity of a petition of nomination or contesting the denial of certification.
Title
School board candidate filing deadline.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Senate | Public Law 34 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 320: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2023-03-29 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2023-03-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 313: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2023-03-27 | House | Representative Prescott added as cosponsor |
2023-03-27 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-03-23 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2023-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Wesco |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 66: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Koch) prevailed; voice vote |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Senator Buck added as second author |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Koch |
Subjects
EDUCATION, Secretary of Education, State Department and Boards
ELECTIONS generally
ELECTIONS, State and Local Boards
SCHOOLS, Officers and Employees (other than teachers)
ELECTIONS generally
ELECTIONS, State and Local Boards
SCHOOLS, Officers and Employees (other than teachers)