IN SB0177 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Natural Resources
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Natural Resources
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Relocates a provision that allows the sale and distribution of nursery stock or wildflower seeds to certain individuals who reside in a state other than Indiana. Provides that the department of natural resources (department) may sell and distribute to a retail or wholesale licensed nursery in Indiana nursery stock or wildflower seeds that the department determines are excess inventory. Limits the period that the department can sell excess nursery and wildflower stock to the nursery. Allows the department to sell excess nursery and wildflower stock to an Indiana wholesale business if certain conditions are met. Allows the department to sell excess nursery stock at cost to a Indiana wholesale nursery. Places a limit on an increase to the department's annual production of nursery stock. Requires the department to publish certain information concerning nurseries that sell seedlings on the division of forestry's Internet web site. Allows the nurseryman to determine whether the nursery's information is published on the division's Internet web site.
Title
Sale of seedlings and wildflower seeds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources - Roll Call 017701 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources - Roll Call 017701 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Natural Resources |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Saunders added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Eberhart added sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 153: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as second author. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-02-03 | Senate | SB 177 Amendment #3 (Delph), prevailed. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Michael Delph. |