IN SB0174 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a proposal to rezone property (by changing the zoning maps) shall be certified to the Marion County city-county council by the metropolitan development commission regardless of whether the proposal receives a favorable recommendation, an unfavorable recommendation, or no recommendation from the metropolitan development commission. Specifies that the provisions concerning approval of rezoning by the city-county council apply regardless of whether there is a favorable recommendation, an unfavorable recommendation, or no recommendation from the metropolitan development commission. (Under current law, the provisions concerning approval by the city-county council of rezoning proposals apply only if the proposal receives a favorable recommendation.) Specifies that the legislative body member in whose district the parcel of real property under consideration is located may submit a request to the president of the legislative body that the proposal be considered. Allows a member of the Indianapolis-Marion County city-county council in whose district the parcel of real property under consideration is located to appeal any decision of a board of zoning appeals approving, denying, or otherwise concerning a use variance (other than a decision affecting real property within the boundaries of an excluded city). Requires the metropolitan development commission to give strong consideration to the first continuance of an appeals hearing that is filed by a member of the city-county council.
Title
Marion County zoning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - House - House Floor - (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Committee on Local Government - Roll Call 017402 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Roll Call 017401 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Committee on Local Government - Roll Call 017402 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Roll Call 017401 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Public Law 88 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-02-24 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2014-02-24 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 249: yeas 88 and nays 9 |
2014-02-20 | House | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-17 | House | Representative Pryor added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-17 | House | Representative Moed added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-17 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Local Government |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Frye added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Kirchhofer added as sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 151: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as coauthor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senator Delph added as coauthor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as coauthor. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Senator Young R Michael added as coauthor. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Senator Waltz added as second author. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Local Government |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Miller Patricia |