IN SB0173 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 210
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Motorsports racing. With respect to professional motorsports racing teams and members, requires, rather than permits, the department of state revenue (department) to adopt rules, guidelines, or other instructions to establish alternative methods of simplifying return filing for race teams and race team members. Specifies that the rules and guidelines required to be adopted by the department must apply retroactively to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2013.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motorsports racing. With respect to professional motorsports racing teams and members, requires, rather than permits, the department of state revenue (department) to adopt rules, guidelines, or other instructions to establish alternative methods of simplifying return filing for race teams and race team members. Specifies that the rules and guidelines required to be adopted by the department must apply retroactively to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2013.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-24SenatePublic Law 210
2016-03-24SenateSigned by the Governor
2016-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-15HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-03-11SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-03-10SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 401: yeas 50, nays 0
2016-03-10SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2016-03-10HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2016-03-10HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 440: yeas 98, nays 0
2016-03-09HouseRepresentative Porter added as conferee
2016-03-09HouseRepresentative Behning removed as conferee
2016-03-09HouseRepresentative Behning added as conferee
2016-03-09HouseRepresentative Porter removed as conferee
2016-03-02HouseHouse advisors appointed: Thompson, Mayfield, Pryor and Macer
2016-03-02HouseHouse conferees appointed: Frizzell and Porter
2016-03-01SenateSenate advisors appointed: Buck, Randolph Lonnie M and Miller Patricia
2016-03-01SenateSenate conferees appointed: Young R Michael and Taylor
2016-03-01SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2016-03-01SenateMotion to dissent filed
2016-02-29HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2016-02-29HouseRepresentative Frye added as cosponsor
2016-02-29HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 263: yeas 96, nays 0
2016-02-25HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-02-22HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-02-11HouseRepresentative Thompson added as cosponsor
2016-02-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2016-01-20SenateReferred to the House
2016-01-19SenateSenator Buck added as coauthor
2016-01-19SenateSenator Taylor added as third author
2016-01-19SenateSenator Miller, Pat added as second author
2016-01-19SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Frizzell
2016-01-19SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 22: yeas 49, nays 1
2016-01-14SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2016-01-14SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-01-12SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-01-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
2016-01-05SenateAuthored by Senator Young R Michael

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/senate/173/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/f/7/2/9f727a46/SB0173.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/7/c/d/d7cdf67c/SB0173.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/7/9/df79cdb2/SB0173.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/6/8/13686376/SB0173.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/5/2/b3528567/SB0173.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/1/a/c21a40ea/SB0173.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/2/9/3d29c07b/SB0173.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/8/a/3/a8a3e8c7/SB0173.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/3/d/b63dc7bf/SB0173.22.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/f/9/c/1f9c183a/SB0173.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/1/7/f/617fb11f/SB0173.263.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/5/9/b559510a/SB0173.401.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/3/6/9a36f2ed/SB0173.440.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback