IN SB0170 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Mine reclamation tax credit. Provides a tax credit for a taxpayer that enters into an agreement with the Indiana economic development corporation (corporation) for a qualified investment for development of property located on reclaimed coal mining land. Provides for the assignment of the credit by a taxpayer to certain lessees. Provides that a taxpayer is not entitled to the credit if the corporation determines that the taxpayer has substantially reduced or ceased its operations in Indiana in order to relocate them within the mine reclamation site. Provides that Spencer County is subject to a provision of the area planning law concerning urban areas.
Title
Mine reclamation tax credit.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Rep. Matt Hostettler [R] | Rep. Timothy Brown [R] |
Rep. Shane Lindauer [R] | Rep. Steve Bartels [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Brown, T., Lindauer, Bartels |
2020-02-03 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Hostettler |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 114: yeas 46, nays 0 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as second author |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as author |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Bray removed as author |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bray |