IN SB0170 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Defines "service provider" and "lawful supervision," and makes it sexual misconduct, a Level 5 felony, for a service provider to knowingly or intentionally engage in sexual intercourse or other sexual conduct with a person who is subject to lawful supervision. Makes it sexual misconduct, a Level 4 felony, for a service provider who is at least 18 years of age to knowingly or intentionally engage in sexual intercourse or other sexual conduct with a person who is: (1) less than 18 years of age; and (2) subject to lawful supervision. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Sexual misconduct by a service provider.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Timothy Skinner [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] |
Rep. Linda Lawson [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Roll Call 017001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Roll Call 017001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Lawson added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Dermody added as sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 149: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Skinner added as coauthor |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as coauthor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Corrections & Criminal Law |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Young R Michael |