IN SB0165 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-02 - Senators Bohacek and Ford Jon added as coauthors
Pending: Senate Commerce & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-02 - Senators Bohacek and Ford Jon added as coauthors
Pending: Senate Commerce & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Welding certifications on public works projects. Requires that contractors on a public works project meet certain standards relating to the welding of structural steel.
Title
Welding certifications on public works projects.
Sponsors
Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Sen. Mark Messmer [R] |
Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senators Bohacek and Ford Jon added as coauthors |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as coauthor |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as second author |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Doriot |
Subjects
ADMINISTRATION, STATE DEPARTMENT OF
CONSTRUCTION
METALS AND METAL DEALERS
PUBLIC WORKS AND IMPROVEMENTS; PUBLIC BUILDINGS; PUBLIC PROPERTY
CONSTRUCTION
METALS AND METAL DEALERS
PUBLIC WORKS AND IMPROVEMENTS; PUBLIC BUILDINGS; PUBLIC PROPERTY
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2023/bills/senate/165/details |
Text | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2023/bills/senate/165/#1.INTR |