IN SB0165 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Public Law 10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Public Law 10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Township board terms of office. Provides for the staggering of the terms of the members of township boards (other than township boards in Marion County) beginning with the 2022 general election. Establishes a process for filling vacancies and resolving ties for township board offices being elected during an election at which staggered terms are implemented.
Title
Township board terms of office. Provides for the staggering of the terms of the members of township boards (other than township boards in Marion County) beginning with the 2022 general election. Establishes a process for filling vacancies and resolving ties for township board offices being elected during an election at which staggered terms are implemented.
Sponsors
Sen. John Crane [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Thompson [R] |
Rep. Scott Pelath [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Public Law 10 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-02-21 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2018-02-20 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 195: yeas 92, nays 2 |
2018-02-19 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-15 | House | Representative Pelath added as cosponsor |
2018-02-15 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-01-29 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Thompson |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 82: yeas 47, nays 2 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as second author |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crane |