IN SB0164 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Representative Bartels added as cosponsor
Pending: House Employment, Labor and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Survivors' benefits. Decreases the years of service that a participant in the state excise police, gaming agent, gaming control officer, and conservation officers' retirement plan must have in the plan at the time of the participant's death in order for the nominated survivor of the participant to be entitled to survivors' benefits from 15 years to 10 years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Survivors' benefits. Decreases the years of service that a participant in the state excise police, gaming agent, gaming control officer, and conservation officers' retirement plan must have in the plan at the time of the participant's death in order for the nominated survivor of the participant to be entitled to survivors' benefits from 15 years to 10 years.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04HouseRepresentative Bartels added as cosponsor
2019-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2019-02-27SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-26SenateSenator Buck added as coauthor
2019-02-26SenateCosponsor: Representative Speedy
2019-02-26SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Frye R
2019-02-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 217: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-02-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-21SenateSenator Ford Jon added as coauthor
2019-02-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-04SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-01-31SenateSenator Niezgodski added as coauthor
2019-01-31SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-14SenateSenator Doriot added as third author
2019-01-10SenateSenator Garten added as second author
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Sandlin

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback