IN SB0164 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Crimes involving deadly weapons. Provides that a person convicted of: (1) two or more felony offenses involving the unlawful use of a deadly weapon; (2) that were not committed as part of the same episode of criminal conduct; may not have the person's convictions expunged.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes involving deadly weapons. Provides that a person convicted of: (1) two or more felony offenses involving the unlawful use of a deadly weapon; (2) that were not committed as part of the same episode of criminal conduct; may not have the person's convictions expunged.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-02HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2015-02-16SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-05SenateRepresentative McMillin added as sponsor
2015-02-05SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 93: yeas 40, nays 8
2015-02-02SenateSenator Merritt added as coauthor
2015-02-02SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-01-29SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-20SenateSenators Schneider, Waltz added as coauthors
2015-01-20SenateSenator Young, M. added as third author
2015-01-20SenateSenator Crider added as second author
2015-01-14SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted, reassigned to Corrections & Criminal Law
2015-01-06SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Rules & Legislative Procedure
2015-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Miller Patricia

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback