IN SB0163 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Recidivist look back periods. Provides that a person commits a Level 6 felony if the person: (1) has a prior conviction for operating while intoxicated that occurred within the previous seven years; or (2) has at least two prior unrelated convictions for operating while intoxicated, two of which occurred in the previous 15 years. Provides that a person who causes serious bodily injury to another person when operating a vehicle while intoxicated commits a Level 5 felony if the person has a previous conviction for operating while intoxicated within the previous seven years. Provides that a person commits a Level 6 felony for theft if the person has a prior unrelated conviction for theft or conversion that occurred within the previous 10 years. (Current law provides that a person commits a Level 6 felony for theft if the person has a prior unrelated conviction for theft or conversion at any time.)
Title
Recidivist look back periods. Provides that a person commits a Level 6 felony if the person: (1) has a prior conviction for operating while intoxicated that occurred within the previous seven years; or (2) has at least two prior unrelated convictions for operating while intoxicated, two of which occurred in the previous 15 years. Provides that a person who causes serious bodily injury to another person when operating a vehicle while intoxicated commits a Level 5 felony if the person has a previous conviction for operating while intoxicated within the previous seven years. Provides that a person commits a Level 6 felony for theft if the person has a prior unrelated conviction for theft or conversion that occurred within the previous 10 years. (Current law provides that a person commits a Level 6 felony for theft if the person has a prior unrelated conviction for theft or conversion at any time.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senator Koch added as second author |
2019-01-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Young J |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 36: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Sandlin) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sandlin |