IN SB0163 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Distributions from escrow accounts. Repeals a requirement that any funds that: (1) exceed $10,000 and are disbursed from an escrow account in connection with a real estate transaction; and (2) are received from a single party to the transaction; must be wired good funds. Makes a conforming amendment.
Title
Distributions from escrow accounts. Repeals a requirement that any funds that: (1) exceed $10,000 and are disbursed from an escrow account in connection with a real estate transaction; and (2) are received from a single party to the transaction; must be wired good funds. Makes a conforming amendment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-01-22 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Washburne |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 33: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senator Zay added as second author |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Messmer |